Bates, Laurel Ann (CPSO#: 60745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3564
Fax: (416) 597-3037
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Defrawy Bates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. El-Defrawy ( CPSO# 61132 )
Dr. L. Bates ( CPSO# 60745 )

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
400 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (647) 621-6129

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (647) 621-6129

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Avenue
Suite 5-142
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (647) 621-5973

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREL ANN BATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1989