Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bates, Shannon Marie (CPSO#: 68074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boris Clinic
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73155
Fax: (905) 525 9548
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thrombosis Unit
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42640
Fax: (905) 574-7625
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON MARIE BATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996