Bathina, Sudheer Reddy (CPSO#: 85689)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Andhra Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2006 to 08 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 09 Nov 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Mar 2016