Batmazian, Laurence Joseph (CPSO#: 106263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 11, UCC, Western University
1151 Richmond Street
London, ON
N6A 3K7
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospitalist Service
242 King Street
Trenton, ON
K8V 3X3
Trenton ON  K8V 3X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-2540
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Hospitalist Service
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville, ON, K6V 1S8
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: 613 345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURENCE JOSEPH BATMAZIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATMAZIAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017