Batt, Jane Andrea Elisabeth (CPSO#: 63518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 77645
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ANDREA ELISABETH BATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1992