Battaglia, Donna Marie (CPSO#: 52900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1985
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 18 Feb 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 22 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]


            As from August 22, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Donna Marie
            Battaglia, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Battaglia
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Battaglia has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions at the current time.