Batten, Adrian Paul (CPSO#: 53037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Laboratories
Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 3900
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6500
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN PAUL BATTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989