Batth, Sukhjit Kaur (CPSO#: 50242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
3 Catalina Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 7X2
Phone: (613) 596-2858
Fax: (613) 596-3293
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Psychiatry
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: (613) 596-3293
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.K. Batth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Batth ( CPSO# 50242 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
3 Catalina Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 7X2
Phone Number: (613) 596-2858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUKHJIT KAUR BATTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Nov 1978
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 04 Dec 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1997