Batthish, Michelle (CPSO#: 82894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Pediatric Rheumatology
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room 3A76
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75382
Fax: (905) 521-4968
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 29 Feb 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE BATTHISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTHISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010