Bauch, Alexandra (CPSO#: 87376)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Free University of Berlin, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008