Bauer, Christopher Allan (CPSO#: 63636)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 21 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992