Bauer, Evan George (CPSO#: 29744)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Names: Bauer, Evan (used until: 06 Nov 1997 )     Neugebauer, Evan (used until: 20 Apr 1986 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011