Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bauer, Robert David Charles (CPSO#: 57297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Cardiovascular Center
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 245-1150
Fax: (416) 245-1166
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bauer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson ( CPSO# 62151 )
Dr. R. Levitan ( CPSO# 57352 )
Dr. R. Bauer ( CPSO# 57297 )

Business Address:
Cardiovascular Centre
Main Floor
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 245-1150

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DAVID CHARLES BAUER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1992