Baugniet, Jessica Lesley (CPSO#: 74976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4
Phone: (905) 279-1700
Fax: (905) 897-9167
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica L. Baugniet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baugniet ( CPSO# 74976 )

Business Address:
Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4
Phone Number: (905) 279-1703

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA LESLEY BAUGNIET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUGNIET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002