Bauld Giffin, Dawn Leanne (CPSO#: 68765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000


Former Name: Bauld, Dawn Leanne (used until: 05 Nov 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
P O Box 5375 Station CSC
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giffin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Dr. D. Bauld Giffin ( CPSO# 68765 )
Dr. J. Giffin ( CPSO# 67996 )

Business Address:
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Center - University of Western Ontario
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3454

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital - London Health Sciences Centre
391 South Street
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
1490 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 2M3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London


Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DAWN LEANNE BAULD GIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAULD GIFFIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000