Baum, Joseph Brian (CPSO#: 32958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 746-0138
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH BRIAN BAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1981