Baumal, Caroline Robin (CPSO#: 63882)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2005