Bauman, Kent Evan (CPSO#: 58236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beechwood Forest Medical Centre
Suite 2
890 Glasgow Street West
Kitchener ON  N2N 3G6
Phone: (519) 744-4293
Fax: (519) 744-6424
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kent Bauman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bauman ( CPSO# 58236 )

Business Address:
Beechwood Forest Medical Centre
Suite 2
890 Glasgow Street West
Kitchener ON  N2N 3G6
Phone Number: (519) 744-4293

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENT EVAN BAUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1988