Baumann, Thomas Peter (CPSO#: 81818)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Basel, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2005