Baunemann, Heiko (CPSO#: 21218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Fax: (807) 346-6251
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEIKO BAUNEMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUNEMANN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Feb 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1973