Bautista, Dorothy Verona (CPSO#: 57032)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 2004