Bautista, Filomena Marcelo (CPSO#: 65282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 315
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 566-8250
Fax: (905) 566-0676
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FILOMENA MARCELO BAUTISTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUTISTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993