Bavington, William James (CPSO#: 21026)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 29 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jan 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996