Baweja, Reena Kaur (CPSO#: 90673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Division of Neurosurgery
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46626
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REENA KAUR BAWEJA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BAWEJA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BAWEJA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BAWEJA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BAWEJA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BAWEJA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BAWEJA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018