Baxendale, Gary R (CPSO#: 67379)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002