Baxter, Frederick John (CPSO#: 27526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 33853
Fax: (905) 521-6019
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frederick J. Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Baxter ( CPSO# 27526 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4041

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK JOHN BAXTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAXTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1975