Bayat, Muhammad Ridwan Hoosen (CPSO#: 104060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7111 Syntex Drive, 3rd Floor
Mississauga, ON
Toronto ON  L5N 8C3
Phone: (647) 869-3294
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD RIDWAN HOOSEN BAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2014