Bayer, Lucy Alice (CPSO#: 55026)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Spanish

Education:Catholic University of Louvain, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 09 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991