Bayley, Theodore Arnold (CPSO#: 15542)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2012