Bayliss, Patricia Ann (CPSO#: 56904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2227 South Millway
Suite 301
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone: (905) 569-9798
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-4120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Ann Bayliss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bayliss ( CPSO# 56904 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Suite 301
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-9798

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANN BAYLISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1987