Bayoumi, Ahmed Mohamed Mahmoud (CPSO#: 60983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5728
Fax: (416) 864-5310
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED MOHAMED MAHMOUD BAYOUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYOUMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1992
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1993