Baz, Salah Mohammed Saleh (CPSO#: 82325)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2005 to 01 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2007