Bazarjani, Sadrollah Seifollahi (CPSO#: 65548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Iran, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13350
Fax: (613) 761-4041
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Merivale Medical Imaging Inc
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean ON  K2G 3H8
Canada
Phone: (613) 727-1072 Ext. 250
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Bazarjani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bazarjani ( CPSO# 65548 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Merivale Medical Imaging Inc
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 727-1072

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SADROLLAH SEIFOLLAHI BAZARJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZARJANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993