Bazile, Emilio (CPSO#: 53445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:University of Haiti, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311 McArthur Avenue
Suite 303
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 746-4845
Fax: (613) 746-7017
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital- Geriatric
Psychiatry Community Services
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Bazile Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bazile ( CPSO# 53445 )

Business Address:
311 McArthur Avenue
Suite 303
Vanier ON  K1L 8M3
Phone Number: (613) 746-4845

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILIO BAZILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZILE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1987