Beach, Craig Aaron (CPSO#: 79257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3853 Rosecrans Street
San Diego CA  92110
United States
Phone: 6196928249
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig A. Beach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Beach ( CPSO# 79257 )

Business Address:
Canadian Mental Health Association
Waterloo Wellington Dufferin
80 Waterloo Avenue
Guelph ON  N1H 0A1
Phone Number: (844) 264-2993

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Dec 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2011 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Craig Aaron Beach may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry,
            only.