Beach, David Arthur (CPSO#: 33300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Picton Clinic
Suite 5C
389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-7870
Fax: (613) 476-6482
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Beach & Tromp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tromp ( CPSO# 58735 )
Dr. D. Beach ( CPSO# 33300 )

Business Address:
Picton Clinic
389 Main Street
Suite 5C
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-7870

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ARTHUR BEACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEACH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1990