Beacock, Peter Ross (CPSO#: 13745)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Sep 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1952
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 27 May 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 28 May 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Sep 1995