Beadel, Gordon Pitt (CPSO#: 77234)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003