Beal, Kerry Constance (CPSO#: 63849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERRY CONSTANCE BEAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992