Beamish, Judith Millicent (CPSO#: 33733)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015