Beamish, Stephen Robert (CPSO#: 63780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 460
70 Victoria Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-5841
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Beamish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Beamish ( CPSO# 63780 )

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
70 Victoria Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-5814

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ROBERT BEAMISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAMISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992