Beasley, Kenneth Alon (CPSO#: 71513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
34 McMurray Street
Brantford ON  N3R 4J1
Phone: (519) 754-2111
Fax: (519) 753-6667
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth A. Beasley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Beasley ( CPSO# 71513 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
34 McMurray Street
Brantford ON  N3R 4J1
Phone Number: (519) 754-2111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ALON BEASLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEASLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2002

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On October 16, 2010, at the Supreme Court in Erie County, a finding of Malpractice was made against Dr. Beasley.