Beattie, Anne Maxine (CPSO#: 55538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304 Victoria Avenue North
Suite 503
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G4
Phone: (905) 525-7907
Fax: (905) 525-9186
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne M. Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beattie ( CPSO# 55538 )

Business Address:
304 Victoria Avenue North
Suite 503
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G4
Phone Number: (905) 525-7907

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MAXINE BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1987