Beattie, Robert Alan (CPSO#: 28645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Dec 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
365 North Front Street
Bell Tower Plaza
Belleville ON  K8P 5A5
Phone: (613) 967-2228
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Parklane Plaza
Unit 8A
815 High Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Canada
Phone: (705) 742-2112
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

1414 King St E
Courtice ON  L1E 3B4
Canada
Phone: 905 743 0090
Fax: 705 743 9016
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert A. Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beattie ( CPSO# 28645 )
Dr. E. Beattie ( CPSO# 90571 )

Business Address:
Parklane Plaza
Unit 8A
815 High Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Phone Number: (705) 742-2112

Business Address:
Bell Tower Plaza
365 North Front Street
Belleville ON  K8P 5A5
Phone Number: (613) 967-2228

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 18, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Alan Beattie,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Beattie to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Beattie has voluntarily limited his practice to Walk-In-Clinics and
                  locums of a duration of a maximum of 60 days.  Dr. Beattie has resigned
                  his prescribing privileges with respect to the following drugs,
                  substances and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as
                  amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 Relinquished

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        Relinquished

            All Other Monitored Drugs
            (as defined under the Narcotic Safety and  Relinquished
            Awareness Act, S.O., 2010, c. 22)