Beattie, Robert Norman (CPSO#: 50124)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016