Beattie, William Scott (CPSO#: 50125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Eaton North 3 464
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 6934
Fax: 4163403698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Scott Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Beattie ( CPSO# 50125 )

Business Address:
Eaton North 3-402
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM SCOTT BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1984