Beatty, John David (CPSO#: 46522)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004