Beaubien, Lise Bernadette Marie (CPSO#: 50126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Names: Beaubien-Ellis, Lise Bernadette Marie (used until: 27 Feb 2012 )     Beaubien, Marie Bernadette Lise (used until: 10 Oct 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
535 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V1
Phone: (613) 746-5350
Fax: (613) 746-5340
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISE BERNADETTE MARIE BEAUBIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUBIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1985