Beaucage, Jennifer Katherine (CPSO#: 82604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Ted Commanda Drive
Garden Village ON  P2B 3J9
Phone: (705) 753-1661
Fax: (705) 753-9669
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KATHERINE BEAUCAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUCAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008