Beauchamp, Robert James (CPSO#: 56100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4430
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Beauchamp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beauchamp ( CPSO# 56100 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  August 18, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 18, 2016, Bluewater Health notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.5 of the Health Professions Act, and s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that on June 29, 2016, Dr. Robert Beauchamp voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at Bluewater Health pending an external investigation of his professional conduct. Subsequently, on September 28, 2016, Bluewater Health placed restrictions/specified conditons on Dr. Beauchamp's privileges at Bluewater Health for the 2016/2017 credentialing year.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 1, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert James Beauchamp,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Beauchamp has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                      DR. ROBERT JAMES BEAUCHAMP
                                           ("Dr. Beauchamp")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, certificate of registration number 56100, am a member
                  of the College. The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (2)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a
                  College investigation bearing File Number 7215695 into allegations that I
                  engaged in professional misconduct by behaving unprofessionally in my
                  anaesthesiology practice. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the
                  ICR Committee ("Effective Date"). 

            (4)   PHP Contract 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, acknowledge that I have entered into a
                        Behavioural Monitoring Contract with the PHP dated January 18, 2017
                        (the "PHP Contract"), which is attached to, and forms part of, this
                        Undertaking as Appendix "A".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, undertake to remain a participant in the PHP, and
                        to fully comply with the requirements of the PHP Contract. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, acknowledge that my return to practise was
                        recommended by the PHP in a letter dated December 2, 2016 ("PHP
                        Letter"), which is attached to, and forms part of, this Undertaking
                        as Appendix "B".
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, undertake to fully comply with the restrictions
                        set out in the PHP Letter as a condition of my return to practise. 
                  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, acknowledge that in the event that I terminate my
                        relationship with the PHP, or if I fail to fully comply with my
                        Behavioural Monitoring Contract or the PHP Letter, such action may
                        constitute a breach of this Undertaking, and an act of professional
                        misconduct. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, undertake to make best efforts to ensure that the
                        PHP provides quarterly reports to the College in respect of my
                        compliance with the PHP Contract and the PHP Letter for one year
                        and, if the College approves, twice per year for the remaining term
                        of the PHP contract.
                  
            (5)   Delivery of reports mandated under PHP Contract

                  (a)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, undertake to obtain copies of all of the reports
                        set out below and, within seven (7) days of receiving the reports,
                        to provide copies of the reports to the College: 
                  
                        (i)   PULSE survey results and feedback reports (two per year); and
                  
                        (ii)  Reports of the PHP to Bluewater Health (at least
                              semi-annually over the term of the PHP contract).
                  
            (6)   Workplace Monitor

                  (a)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, acknowledge and agree that I shall practice with
                        a Workplace Monitor, who is a Chief of Staff, or a colleague with
                        similar responsibilities, at any hospital or Practice Location
                        where I practise or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff") or other
                        individual approved by the College (the "Workplace Monitor").  The
                        Workplace Monitor will be required to execute an undertaking in the
                        form attached hereto as Appendix "C".  I have reviewed this
                        undertaking and understand what is required of the Workplace
                        Monitor which includes, without limiting the generality of the
                        foregoing:
                  
                        (i)   written reports to the College every quarter for a minimum of
                              one year;
                  
                        (ii)  such reports to include information regarding my behaviour,
                              conduct, communications and professionalism, and my
                              compliance with the PHP Contract and the PHP Letter;
                  
                        (iii) immediate reporting to the College if he or she has any
                              concerns about my conduct, behaviour, professionalism or
                              care; about my capacity to practise medicine; that my
                              patients may be at risk of harm or injury; or that I am not
                              in compliance with my Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking or my Behavioural Monitoring Contract may lead to an inquiry
                  regarding my capacity to practise medicine, may constitute an act of
                  professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral
                  of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College
                  and/or the Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (8)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (9)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Beauchamp, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my compliance with the PHP Contract and the
                  PHP Letter described above:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice, conduct, care or capacity; and/or
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (11)  I, Beauchamp, agree to provide the College with the names of all my
                  treating health professionals (past and present), upon the College's
                  request, and hereby give my irrevocable consent to the PHP, OHIP, other
                  health professionals who are or who have provided health services to me
                  and any person who possesses information relevant to my capacity to
                  practise medicine or who facilitates my compliance with the PHP Contract
                  and/or the PHP Letter described above to disclose to the College, and to
                  one another, any information:

                  (i)   relevant to this Undertaking or the circumstances of my entering
                        into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (ii)  relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (iii) which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to
                        my patients.
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Beauchamp, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff and to provide said Chief(s) of
                  Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances
                  of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from
                  the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Beauchamp, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Beauchamp
                        engaged in professional misconduct by behaving unprofessionally in
                        his anaesthesiology practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Beauchamp will comply with the terms of his Return to
                              Work Agreement with Bluewater Health. 
                        *     The PHP and the Chief of Staff at Bluewater Health will
                              provide periodic reports to the College about Dr. Beauchamp.
                        *     Dr. Beauchamp will comply with the terms of his PHP Contract.
                        *     Dr. Beauchamp will provide the College with copies of certain
                              reports mandated under his PHP Contract.

            (14)  I, Dr. Beauchamp, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Beauchamp, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  any information it deems necessary to any person who, or organization or
                  institution that requests or requires this information for the purposes
                  of facilitating or verifying my compliance with this Undertaking or the
                  Workplace Monitor's compliance with the Workplace Monitor's undertaking
                  at Appendix "C." 

            (16)  I, Dr. Beauchamp, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates or verifies my compliance with this Undertaking or the
                  Workplace Monitor's undertaking at Appendix "C" to disclose to the
                  College any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Workplace Monitor's Undertaking at Appendix "C";
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   which the person reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of
                        harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 1, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert James Beauchamp to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 1, 2017:

Dr. Beauchamp will comply with the terms of his Return to Work Agreement with Bluewater Health.

The PHP and the Chief of Staff at Bluewater Health will provide periodic reports to the College about Dr. Beauchamp.

Dr. Beauchamp will comply with the terms of his PHP Contract.

Dr. Beauchamp will provide the College with copies of certain reports mandated under his PHP Contract.